RI H7525 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Commercial Law - General Regulatory Provisions -the Rights Of Marina Users' (would Create The Rhode Island Marina Users' Bill Of Rights Act Which Would Afford Certain Rights To Boat Owners Renting Space At Rhode Island Marinas.)
Title
An Act Relating To Commercial Law - General Regulatory Provisions -the Rights Of Marina Users' (would Create The Rhode Island Marina Users' Bill Of Rights Act Which Would Afford Certain Rights To Boat Owners Renting Space At Rhode Island Marinas.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] | Rep. Peter Petrarca [D] |
Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-20 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7525.pdf |