RI H7521 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-20 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/25/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-20 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/25/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a new and separate calendar within the superior court to expediently hear and decide land use matters concerning the development of renewable energy resources.
Title
Courts
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/11/2018) |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7521.pdf |