RI H7515 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- MICROPLASTICS REDUCTION ACT - Prohibits a manufacturer from selling, offering for sale, or distributing into commerce any product containing synthetic polymer micro particles beginning January 1, 2028.
Title
Prohibits a manufacturer from selling, offering for sale, or distributing into commerce any product containing synthetic polymer micro particles beginning January 1, 2028.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7515.pdf |