RI H7512 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the current authorization for town of Portsmouth municipal court and establishes authorization which expands the jurisdiction of Portsmouth municipal court to include a municipal housing court to adjudicate violations of the state building code.
Title
General Powers--portsmouth Municipal Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-05 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-04-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/05/2022) |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-04-22 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |