RI H7500 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require those who are convicted or who plead to the charge of cruelty to animals to be financially responsible for the cost of care for those animals while they are in the care of the Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Doreen Costa [R] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2014) |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |