RI H7497 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the council on elementary and secondary education, the RI teachers' advisory council and the attorney general's office to create regulations and programs for students who have been suspended, or otherwise removed from a regular classroom setting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health And Safety Of Pupils

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-02-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback