RI H7487 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires general treasurer upon request from RIDE to establish education savings account to assist remote-learning students with educational support exempt from state income tax.
Title
Education Savings Accounts Program
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7487.pdf |