RI H7472 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide funding, under the RIte Start Program, for abortions necessary to preserve the life of the mother, or in the case of pregnancies as the result of rape or incest
Title
Healthcare For Children And Pregnant Women
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Finn [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2014) |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7472.pdf |