RI H7471 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Licenses (would Repeal The Exemption Granted To Plat 45, Lot 042 In The Town Of Smithfield If Any Class B, C, Or I License Is Not Renewed By December 31, 2011)
Title
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Licenses (would Repeal The Exemption Granted To Plat 45, Lot 042 In The Town Of Smithfield If Any Class B, C, Or I License Is Not Renewed By December 31, 2011)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2012-04-26 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-26 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-04-12 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/26/2012) | |
2012-04-11 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-04-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2012) | |
2012-04-04 | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs | |
2012-04-03 | House read and passed | |
2012-03-22 | Placed on House Calendar (04/03/2012) | |
2012-03-22 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2012) | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7471.pdf |