RI H7462 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of P.J.F. limited HVAC service person's license upon examination for work on or repair of electric wiring/equipment located on heating/AC systems.
Title
Mechanical Trades
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2022) |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7462.pdf |