RI H7456 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Makes changes in the definitions of what constitutes unlawful confinement of any sow during gestation, calf raised for veal or egg-laying hen kept on a farm, and would apply them throughout the chapter accordingly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful Confinement Of A Covered Animal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-05-02HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-04-27HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/02/2018)
2018-04-26HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-04-24HouseScheduled for consideration (04/26/2018)
2018-04-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018)
2018-02-27HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/01/2018)
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback