RI H7452 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 To Mystic Aquarium For Expansion Of The Stem Advantage Program (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $500,000 To Expand The Stem Advantage Program.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 To Mystic Aquarium For Expansion Of The Stem Advantage Program (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $500,000 To Expand The Stem Advantage Program.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2022) |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7452.pdf |