RI H7451 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a dedicated grant of funding to DEM, specifically to commission an environmental study for the public benefit.
Title
Inspection Of Dams And Reservoirs -- Environmental Study Of Johnson's Pond
Sponsors
Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7451.pdf |