RI H7451 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 For The Jason Project (jason Project Serves Students & Teachers With Its After-school Initiative, Known As Immersion Learning, & Has Established A Panoply Of Educational Goals & Strategies To Engage Students In The Areas Of Science, Technology, & Literacy/ Help Teachers To....)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 For The Jason Project (jason Project Serves Students & Teachers With Its After-school Initiative, Known As Immersion Learning, & Has Established A Panoply Of Educational Goals & Strategies To Engage Students In The Areas Of Science, Technology, & Literacy/ Help Teachers To....)
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Peter Petrarca [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] |
Rep. Michael Tarro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-04-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2012) | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7451.pdf |