RI H7449 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies a presumption applying to firefighters that if any type of cancer is found in a firefighter with three (3) exceptions would be conclusively presumed to be an occupational cancer arising out of their employment.
Title
Cancer Benefits For Firefighters
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-08 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-07-05 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2020-07-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (07/08/2020) |
2020-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |