RI H7448 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/12/2020)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/12/2020)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that in the town of Cumberland, the maximum height allowed for a commercial or residential condominium complex would be no more than thirty-five feet (35').
Title
Condominium Law
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/12/2020) |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7448.pdf |