RI H7443 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 19 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Distinguishes the criminal penalties for violating a final order of the Contractors' Registration Board. Judgments less than $5,000 are misdemeanors; judgments $5,000 or more are felonies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractors - Registration And Licensing Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-14SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-06HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/06/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-02-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018)
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback