RI H7440 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND WILDLIFE -- LOBSTERS AND OTHER CRUSTACEANS - Amends the current law to allow for the harvesting of blue crabs during the hours of darkness.
Title
Amends the current law to allow for the harvesting of blue crabs during the hours of darkness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Committee on Environment and Natural Resources: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Committee on Environment and Natural Resources: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2024-03-26 | House | House read and passed |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/26/2024) |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-02-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/29/2024) |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |