RI H7420 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Relating To Making Appropriations For The Support Of The State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2012
Title
Joint Resolution Relating To Making Appropriations For The Support Of The State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2012
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Committee heard and continued | |
2012-05-02 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2012) | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7420.pdf |