RI H7419 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the advertising of unhealthy food and beverage products in schools that do not meet minimum federal and state governmental nutrition standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health And Safety Of Pupils

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04HouseSigned by Governor
2018-05-30HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-30SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Senate Education
2018-05-17HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-05-11HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/17/2018)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for consideration (05/09/2018)
2018-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback