RI H7415 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Add construction equipment, machinery, computers and computer equipment to the list of items to which sales tax benefits granted for approved projects may apply
Title
Rhode Island Commerce Corporation
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2014) |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7415.pdf |