RI H7413 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the 2004 Renewable Energy Standard Schedule Program, which required the suppliers of retail electricity to purchase increasing minimum amounts of renewable energy from 2019 to 2035.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable Energy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-27HouseSigned by Governor
2016-06-21HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-18SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2016-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
2016-06-08HouseHouse passed Sub A
2016-06-03HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/08/2016)
2016-05-31HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2016-05-27HouseScheduled for consideration (05/31/2016)
2016-02-09HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2016)
2016-01-29HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback