RI H7412 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all menstrual products sold in the state bear a label listing the name of each ingredient or component of the device in order of the most predominant ingredient to the least predominant ingredient.
Title
Rhode Island Food, Drugs, And Cosmetics Act
Sponsors
Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7412.pdf |