RI H7402 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the criminal penalty for violating a contractors' board final order by the amount of the monetary judgment imposed.
Title
Contractors’ Registration And Licensing Board
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2016) |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7402.pdf |