RI H7401 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/22/2022)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/22/2022)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a digital application distribution platform that has cumulative sales annually in excess of ($10,000,000) from requiring a developer of a software application to engage in an exclusive distribution agreement with the distribution platform.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions -- Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/22/2022) |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7401.pdf |