RI H7400 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Rhode Island data Transparency and Privacy Protection Act" to identify information collected by online service providers and commercial websites.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions -- Rhode Island Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7400.pdf |