RI H7400 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires persons in government custody use their actual residence for census and redistricting purposes as determined by the department of corrections and the secretary of state.
Title
Residence Of Those In Government Custody Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Doreen Costa [R] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2016) |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7400.pdf |