RI H7399 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Restriction On Tolling (proposes A Constitutional Amendment Providing That Any New Highway Or Bridge Toll On Passenger Vehicles Would Require Voter Approval Statewide And Also In The Municipalities Where They Are To Be Located.)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Restriction On Tolling (proposes A Constitutional Amendment Providing That Any New Highway Or Bridge Toll On Passenger Vehicles Would Require Voter Approval Statewide And Also In The Municipalities Where They Are To Be Located.)
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018) |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7399.pdf |