RI H7398 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Excludes chronic intractable pain from the definition of acute pain management. Prescribes new guidelines for treatment based upon 2016 CDC Guideline for Prescribing Opioids for Chronic Pain.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Controlled Substances Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseHouse read and passed
2020-03-06HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/11/2020)
2020-03-04HouseCommittee recommends passage
2020-02-28HouseScheduled for consideration (03/04/2020)
2020-02-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2020-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2020)
2020-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback