RI H7393 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Neil Fachon Terminally Ill Patients' Right To Try Act of 2022," which establishes the conditions for the use of experimental treatments for terminally ill patients.
Title
Treatment For Patients With Terminal Illness -- The Neil Fachon Terminally Ill Patients' Right To Try Act Of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2022-03-15 | House | House read and passed |
2022-03-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |