RI H7390 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state contracted human services providers to pay their employees a starting hourly wage, of no less than twenty-one dollars ($21.00) per hour, and to include wage incremental raises for existing employees.
Title
Office Of Health And Human Services -- Minimum Wage For Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7390.pdf |