RI H7388 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Children's Catastrophic Illness in Children Relief Fund to provide finance assistance to families for medical expenses not covered by state or federal programs or insurance contract.
Title
Catastrophic Illness In Children Relief Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7388.pdf |