RI H7373 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the tax imposed on little cigars be imposed in the same manner as the tax imposed on cigarettes, that 25% of such revenue would be applied to smoking cessation programs, would provide that little cigars be sold in packs of (20) or more.
Title
Little Cigar Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2016) |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7373.pdf |