RI H7373 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reclassify the offense of shoplifting by limiting its available sanctions to fines rather than a prison term.
Title
Shoplifting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2014) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7373.pdf |