RI H7366 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a safety barrier or safety netting would be erected on the Mount Hope Bridge, the Claiborne Pell Bridge, and the Jamestown Verrazzano Bridge, no later than January 1, 2022.
Title
Rhode Island Turnpike And Bridge Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2020-02-24 | House | Meeting postponed (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7366.pdf |