RI H7359 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that all electricity, equipment and maintenance costs for street lighting along state maintained roadways in the city of Pawtucket would be paid by the state of Rhode Island
Title
Construction And Maintenance Of State Roads
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7359.pdf |