RI H7352 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new standards for determining whether a state work license applicant's past criminal contacts/convictions should disqualify them from receiving a government-issued license.
Title
Licensing
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/12/2020) |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7352.pdf |