RI H7352 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making Appropriations Of $175,000 To The Rhode Island Community Food Bank (this Joint Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of An Additional One Hundred Seventy-five Thousand Dollars ($175,000) To The Rhode Island Community Food Bank.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making Appropriations Of $175,000 To The Rhode Island Community Food Bank (this Joint Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of An Additional One Hundred Seventy-five Thousand Dollars ($175,000) To The Rhode Island Community Food Bank.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7352.pdf |