RI H7346 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a pharmacist to prescribe and dispense FDA-approved hormonal contraceptive patches and self-administered oral hormonal contraceptives, provided that the pharmacist has completed a training program approved by the state board of pharmacy.
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2022-03-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-03-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/17/2022) |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-03-08 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2022) |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |