RI H7345 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the appropriation of the sum of seven hundred fifty thousand dollars ($750,000) to the Westerly Higher Education and Job Skills Center, for the fiscal year commencing July 1, 2016.
Title
Relating To The Westerly Higher Education And Job Skills Center
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2016) |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7345.pdf |