RI H7341 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require that each mammography report given to a patient must include information about the patient's breast density and advise that under certain circumstances the patient may benefit from a breast ultrasound screening
Title
Health And Safety - The Breast Cancer Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/22/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2014) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2014-05-07 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-05-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2014) |
2014-04-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-04-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-03-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2014) |
2014-02-25 | House | Meeting postponed (02/25/2014) |
2014-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |