RI H7340 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION TAX - Eliminates the gross earning tax for every corporation whose principal business is manufacturing, selling, distributing and/or transmitting current of electricity and natural gas to be used for light, heat, or motive power.
Title
Eliminates the gross earning tax for every corporation whose principal business is manufacturing, selling, distributing and/or transmitting current of electricity and natural gas to be used for light, heat, or motive power.
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Jon Brien [I] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Brian Rea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7340.pdf |