RI H7339 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- MOTION PICTURE PRODUCTION TAX CREDITS - Eliminates the sunset provision for the motion picture production tax credit.
Title
Eliminates the sunset provision for the motion picture production tax credit.
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/02/2024) |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7339.pdf |