RI H7338 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution To Approve, Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (majority Vote Requirement Through Instant Runoff Voting For General Officers And General Assembly Members' Election) (sets A Referendum On A State Constitutional Amendment That Would Require A Majority Of Votes Cast For General Officers And General Assembly Members/provides For A Run-off Of The Top 2 Highest Vote Getters In The Event No One Candidate Secures A Majority.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution To Approve, Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (majority Vote Requirement Through Instant Runoff Voting For General Officers And General Assembly Members' Election) (sets A Referendum On A State Constitutional Amendment That Would Require A Majority Of Votes Cast For General Officers And General Assembly Members/provides For A Run-off Of The Top 2 Highest Vote Getters In The Event No One Candidate Secures A Majority.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback