RI H7329 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the governor's appointments to the RIPTA authority shall include a regular user of fixed-route RIPTA transportation and also a disabled person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Public Transit Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-08 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-14HouseSigned by Governor
2016-06-08HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-08SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2016-06-02SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/08/2016)
2016-06-01SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2016-05-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2016)
2016-05-19SenateReferred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
2016-05-18HouseHouse read and passed
2016-05-13HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/18/2016)
2016-04-27HouseCommittee recommends passage
2016-04-25HouseScheduled for consideration (04/27/2016)
2016-03-30HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-03-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2016)
2016-01-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback