RI H7323 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations -- Overtime Calculation (prohibit Employers To Use Fluctuating Workweek Method To Calculate The Overtime Pay For Delivery Drivers Or Sales Merchandisers)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations -- Overtime Calculation (prohibit Employers To Use Fluctuating Workweek Method To Calculate The Overtime Pay For Delivery Drivers Or Sales Merchandisers)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-10 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-09 | House passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-09 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-06-09 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-23 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7323.pdf |