RI H7322 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires professional solicitors fund-raisers to disclose percent of contribution retained by fundraiser along with specific statement to be made prior to all solicitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solicitation By Charitable Organizations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2016)
2016-01-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback