RI H7311 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve, Publish And Submit To The Electors--a Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (majority Vote Requirement Through Instant Runoff Voting For General Officers And General Assembly Members' Election) (requires The Winning Candidate For General Offices And The General Assembly To Receive A Majority Of The Votes Cast.)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve, Publish And Submit To The Electors--a Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (majority Vote Requirement Through Instant Runoff Voting For General Officers And General Assembly Members' Election) (requires The Winning Candidate For General Offices And The General Assembly To Receive A Majority Of The Votes Cast.)
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Michael Marcello [D] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2016) |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7311.pdf |