RI H7305 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the responsibility of the division of public buildings, and the department of administration to acquire suitable courtrooms for the sessions of the district court.
Title
District Court
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Senate held on desk |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2014) |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-04-09 | House | House read and passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/09/2014) |
2014-04-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/01/2014) |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2014) |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |