RI H7299 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Streamlining New Business Startup Processes (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Streamlining New Business Startups In Rhode Island, And Reports Back By March 1, 2017 And Expires On June 1, 2017.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Streamlining New Business Startup Processes (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Streamlining New Business Startups In Rhode Island, And Reports Back By March 1, 2017 And Expires On June 1, 2017.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-04-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/27/2016) |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-04-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/13/2016) |
2016-02-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |